Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/03/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/09/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/12/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/12/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/19/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/19/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/19/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/19/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/10/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/10/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/10/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/10/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/10/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/17/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/17/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/24/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/24/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/10/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/10/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/10/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/16/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/06/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/06/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/13/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/13/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/13/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/13/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/26/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/26/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/04/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 11/04/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/04/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/04/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 11/04/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/04/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/05/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/05/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 11/17/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/17/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/17/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/17/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/19/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/19/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/01/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 12/01/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 12/01/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/01/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/01/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/01/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/08/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 12/08/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 12/08/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 12/08/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/08/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/08/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/14/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/14/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/16/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/16/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/16/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/12/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/12/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/12/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/12/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/12/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/12/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 01/12/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/12/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/12/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 01/13/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 01/13/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/20/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/20/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/20/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/20/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/21/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/21/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/27/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/27/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 01/27/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/02/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/24/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/13/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/13/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/13/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/26/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/26/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/26/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/26/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/06/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/19/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/27/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/23/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/01/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/01/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/20/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/16/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/16/2010