Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
08/19/2009 Became Public Law No: 111-57.
08/19/2009 Signed by President.
08/11/2009 Presented to President.
08/04/2009 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8714-8715)
07/30/2009 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
06/15/2009 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 374 - 0 (Roll no. 337).(text: CR H6757)
05/07/2009 Introduced in House