Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/13/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/13/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/13/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/14/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 05/14/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 05/14/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/14/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/14/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/14/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/14/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/15/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/15/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/19/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/19/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/19/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/19/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/20/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/20/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/21/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/02/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/02/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/02/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/02/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/02/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/02/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/02/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/03/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/03/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/03/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/04/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/04/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/08/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 06/08/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/08/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/08/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/09/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/09/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/10/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/11/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/15/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/15/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/15/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/15/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/16/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/16/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 06/16/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/16/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/17/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/17/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/18/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/23/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/23/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/23/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 06/24/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/26/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/07/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/07/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/07/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/09/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/09/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/09/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/13/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/13/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 07/15/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/15/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/20/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/20/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/20/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/22/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/22/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 07/22/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/22/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/22/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/23/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/23/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/23/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/23/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/23/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/23/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/24/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/24/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/24/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/24/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/29/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/30/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/08/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/14/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/15/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/21/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/21/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/22/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/23/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/25/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/25/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/25/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/01/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/08/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 10/13/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 10/15/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/20/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/20/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/01/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 12/01/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 12/01/2009