Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/19/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/19/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/19/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/19/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/17/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/22/2010