Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
06/30/2009 Became Public Law No: 111-36.
06/30/2009 Signed by President.
06/19/2009 Presented to President.
06/17/2009 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6740-6741)
06/09/2009 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6330)
06/08/2009 Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 111-139.
05/12/2009 Introduced in House