Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/13/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/13/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 05/14/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/14/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/21/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/02/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/11/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/19/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/19/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/19/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/19/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/25/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/25/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 06/25/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/25/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/09/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/09/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 07/09/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/09/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/09/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/22/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/22/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/22/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 07/31/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/29/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 09/29/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 10/15/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/16/2010