Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/02/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 07/10/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/30/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/30/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/07/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 06/16/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/13/2010