Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/12/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/12/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/12/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/12/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/12/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/14/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/14/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/14/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 05/14/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/14/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/14/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/14/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/14/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/18/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/18/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/18/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/20/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/20/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/20/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/20/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/02/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 06/02/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/08/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/11/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/11/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/11/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/12/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/12/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/26/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/26/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/09/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/13/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/16/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/16/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 07/22/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/22/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/31/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/31/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/10/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/08/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/19/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 01/19/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/19/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/04/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/24/2010