Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 05/12/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/13/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 05/13/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/13/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/13/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/14/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/14/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/14/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/18/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/18/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/18/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/18/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 05/20/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/20/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/20/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/21/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/21/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/21/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/03/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/03/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 06/03/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 06/08/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 06/08/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/09/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 06/16/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 06/17/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/23/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/23/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 07/13/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 10/15/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/15/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/15/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 11/17/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/02/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/21/2010