Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 10/20/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/24/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/12/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/12/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/16/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/16/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/16/2010