There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Proud to Be an American Citizen Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of Homeland Security to provide for ceremonies on or near Independence Day for administering oaths of allegiance to legal immigrants whose applications for naturalization have been approved.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/12/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/12/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/12/2009Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/12/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 05/12/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/12/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/14/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/10/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/25/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 06/26/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/08/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/08/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/10/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/10/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/10/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/15/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/15/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/20/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/20/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/13/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/13/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/13/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/18/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/24/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/27/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 06/10/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/12/2009 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law06/12/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2363.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2363. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/12/2009)

Proud to Be an American Citizen Act - Directs the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) to make funds available annually to the Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services or to approved public or private nonprofit entities to support public ceremonies for administering oaths of allegiance to naturalizing legal immigrants.

States that such ceremonies shall: (1) be held on a date that is on or near Independence Day; and (2) include appropriate outreach, ceremonial, and celebratory activities.

Specifies: (1) ceremony fund limits ($5,000); and (2) permitted fund uses.