Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/12/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 05/12/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/12/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/13/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/13/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/18/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/18/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/18/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 05/18/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/18/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/02/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/02/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 06/10/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/12/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/17/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/26/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/15/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/22/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/09/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/09/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/22/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/23/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/08/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/13/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/27/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 11/03/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 11/05/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/19/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 12/01/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 01/27/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/27/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/22/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/09/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/19/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/20/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/22/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/22/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/22/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/23/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/16/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/16/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/16/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 12/09/2010