Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/10/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/25/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/01/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/29/2010