Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/21/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/02/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/02/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/02/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/02/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/02/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/02/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/03/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/03/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/03/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 06/03/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/03/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/04/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/04/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 06/08/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/08/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 06/08/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/08/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/09/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/09/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 06/09/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/09/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/10/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/10/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/10/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/10/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 06/12/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/12/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/12/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/16/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/16/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/18/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/24/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/24/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/07/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/07/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/07/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/07/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/09/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 07/15/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/15/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/15/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/15/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 07/15/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/15/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/15/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/20/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/20/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/20/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/22/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/28/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/30/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 09/17/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/07/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 10/26/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/02/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/09/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 03/10/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/12/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/13/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/22/2010