Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/12/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/16/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/16/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/16/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 06/16/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/16/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/17/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/09/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/14/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/25/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/25/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/25/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/25/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/29/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 10/06/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/06/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/08/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/08/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/21/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 10/23/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/28/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/02/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/03/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/06/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/16/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/01/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/02/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 12/02/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/16/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 12/19/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/19/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 01/13/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 01/19/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/19/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/19/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 01/19/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/26/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/22/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/02/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/03/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/03/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/03/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 03/03/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/04/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/09/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/09/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/09/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/09/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/10/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/10/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/15/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/15/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/15/2010