Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/13/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 05/13/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 05/20/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/20/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/20/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/20/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/20/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/20/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/20/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/20/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/21/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/21/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/04/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/04/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/10/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 06/10/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/10/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/26/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/07/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/07/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/07/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 07/10/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/24/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 10/29/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/29/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/29/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/29/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/03/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 11/03/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 11/06/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/01/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/01/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 12/09/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/23/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/10/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/15/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/23/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 03/25/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/25/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/25/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 03/25/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/25/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/25/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/25/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/13/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 04/13/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 04/15/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/20/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/20/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 04/28/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/29/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 04/29/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/06/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/11/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/11/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/13/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/13/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/18/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/18/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 05/25/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/26/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 06/09/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/22/2010
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/22/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/22/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/24/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/28/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/14/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/19/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/19/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/19/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/28/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/29/2010
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 08/10/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/14/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/14/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/14/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/14/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/14/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/15/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/16/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/16/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 09/22/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/22/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/22/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/22/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/28/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/28/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/28/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/28/2010