There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Nurse and Health Care Worker Protection Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Labor to issue an occupational safety and health standard to reduce injuries to patients, direct-care registered nurses, and all other health care workers by establishing a safe patient handling and injury prevention standard, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/13/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
06/11/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
05/14/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/13/2009Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
05/13/2009Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
05/13/2009Referred to House Education and Labor
Action By: House of Representatives
05/13/2009Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/13/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/13/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/07/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/15/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/15/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/20/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/27/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/28/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/06/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/20/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 10/26/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/04/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/16/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 12/01/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/10/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/13/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/13/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/12/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/13/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/18/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/18/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/18/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/18/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/18/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/25/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/26/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/15/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/15/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/16/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/17/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/22/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/23/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/30/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/26/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/29/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/29/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/29/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/29/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/30/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 08/10/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/23/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/28/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 09/28/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 09/29/2010

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor05/13/2009 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Workforce Protections06/11/2009 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce05/13/2009 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health05/14/2009 Referred to
House Ways and Means05/13/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2381. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/13/2009)

Nurse and Health Care Worker Protection Act of 2009 - Requires the Secretary of Labor to propose a standard on safe patient handling and injury prevention to prevent musculoskeletal disorders for direct-care registered nurses and all other health care workers that requires the use of engineering controls to lift patients and the elimination of manual lifting of patients through the use of mechanical devices, except where patient care may be compromised.

Requires health care employers to: (1) develop and implement a safe patient handling and injury prevention plan; (2) provide their workers with training on safe patient handling and injury prevention; and (3) post a uniform notice that explains the standard and the procedures to report patient handling-related injuries. Requires the Secretary to conduct unscheduled inspections to ensure compliance with safety standards.

Allows health care workers to: (1) refuse to accept an assignment in a health care facility that violates safety standards or for which such worker has not received required training; and (2) file complaints against employers who violate this Act. Prohibits employers from taking adverse actions against any health care worker who in good faith reports a violation, participates in an investigation or proceeding, or discusses violations.

Authorizes health care workers who have been discharged, discriminated, or retaliated against in violation of this Act to bring legal action for reinstatement, reimbursement of lost compensation, attorneys' fees, court costs, and other damages.

Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to establish a grant program for purchasing safe patient handling and injury prevention equipment for health care facilities.