Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/13/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/07/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/15/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/15/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/20/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/27/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/28/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/06/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/20/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 10/26/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/04/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/16/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 12/01/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/10/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/13/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/13/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/12/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/13/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/18/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/18/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/18/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/18/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/18/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/25/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/26/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/15/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/15/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/16/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/17/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/22/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/23/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/30/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/26/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/29/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/29/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/29/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/29/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/30/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 08/10/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/23/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/28/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 09/28/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 09/29/2010