Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 05/13/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/15/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/18/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/18/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/19/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/03/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/12/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/23/2009