Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/19/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/19/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/19/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/19/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/21/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/21/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/21/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/21/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/04/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/08/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/08/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/10/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/10/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/11/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/11/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/12/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/08/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/13/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/22/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/23/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 10/01/2009