Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/13/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/02/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/12/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/24/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/22/2010