There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of Defense to submit a report to Congress outlining the United States exit strategy for United States military forces in Afghanistan participating in Operation Enduring Freedom.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/14/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
05/14/2009Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/14/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (101)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/14/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/14/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/18/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/18/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/18/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 05/19/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/21/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/21/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/09/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/12/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/15/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/19/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/19/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/23/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/23/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/24/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/24/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/26/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/13/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/08/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/08/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/16/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/01/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/26/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/03/2009

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services05/14/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2404.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2404. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/14/2009)

Directs the Secretary of Defense to submit a report to Congress, by December 31, 2009, outlining the exit strategy for U.S. military forces in Afghanistan participating in Operation Enduring Freedom.