Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/14/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/14/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/18/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/18/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/18/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 05/19/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/21/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/21/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/09/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/12/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/15/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/19/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/19/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/23/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/23/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/24/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/24/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/26/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/13/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/08/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/08/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/16/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/01/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/26/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/03/2009