Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 05/14/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/19/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/19/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/02/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/02/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/23/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/23/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/23/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/23/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/23/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/23/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/23/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/23/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/23/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/23/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/24/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/24/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/24/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/24/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/24/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/24/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/24/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/31/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 07/31/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/31/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/31/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/31/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/31/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 07/31/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/08/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/08/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/08/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/08/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/08/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/08/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/14/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/25/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/30/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/07/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/08/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 10/13/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 10/13/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 10/13/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/13/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 10/13/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/13/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/14/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 10/14/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/14/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/21/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/21/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/29/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/29/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/02/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/02/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/02/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 11/16/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/17/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 12/01/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/01/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 12/07/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 12/15/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/16/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 01/12/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/02/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/09/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/09/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/20/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/22/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/26/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/18/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/08/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/16/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/22/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 06/22/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/24/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 06/24/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/15/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/19/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/14/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/15/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/15/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 09/22/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/22/2010