Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/14/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/15/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/15/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/15/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/21/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/03/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/03/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/18/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/18/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/18/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/18/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/26/2009