Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/21/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 10/22/2009
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 06/15/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 12/02/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/07/2010