Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/04/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/16/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/16/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/23/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/23/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/23/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/23/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/26/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/26/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/26/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/08/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/08/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/08/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/08/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/08/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/08/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/08/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/08/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/09/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/09/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/09/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/09/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/20/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/20/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/20/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/20/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/28/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/28/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/28/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/29/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/29/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/10/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/10/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/10/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/10/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/10/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/10/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/10/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/22/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/22/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/07/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/07/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/07/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/15/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/23/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/23/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/23/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 10/23/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/18/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 11/18/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/18/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/18/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/16/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/03/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/03/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/16/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/16/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/28/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/28/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/15/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/15/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/15/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/15/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/29/2010