Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 05/14/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 05/19/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/02/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/03/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/03/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/03/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/08/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/08/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/08/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/09/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/09/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/09/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/10/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/12/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/19/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/19/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/23/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/09/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/09/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/28/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/29/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/08/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/08/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/08/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/08/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/09/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/14/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/14/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/27/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 04/27/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/18/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/28/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 11/29/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/29/2010