Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/27/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/28/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/28/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/04/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/12/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/12/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/27/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/23/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/23/2010