Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
08/19/2009 Became Public Law No: 111-58.
08/19/2009 Signed by President.
08/11/2009 Presented to President.
08/04/2009 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8714-8715)
07/30/2009 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
06/15/2009 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6758)
05/14/2009 Introduced in House