Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/14/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/14/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/14/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/18/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/08/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/10/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/10/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/18/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/18/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/16/2009