Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/15/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/16/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/17/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/18/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/09/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/09/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/17/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/22/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/27/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/27/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/15/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/15/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/15/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/15/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/25/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/25/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/15/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/15/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/03/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 01/13/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/20/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/02/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 02/23/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 02/23/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/11/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/16/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/12/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/12/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/20/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/25/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/10/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/29/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/14/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/19/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/15/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/28/2010