Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/10/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/01/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 11/03/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/16/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/16/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 12/16/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/20/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 01/20/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 01/20/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/20/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 01/27/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 03/11/2010