Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/15/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/15/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 05/15/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 05/15/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 05/15/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/19/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/19/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 05/19/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/20/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 05/21/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/21/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/02/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/02/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/02/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/03/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 06/03/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/03/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/03/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/03/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/03/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/03/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/09/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/09/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/09/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 06/09/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/10/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/11/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 06/11/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/11/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/15/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/15/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/15/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/16/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/16/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/16/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/16/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/17/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/17/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 06/17/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/18/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/18/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/18/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/19/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/19/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/24/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/24/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/24/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/25/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/25/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/26/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/26/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/26/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/07/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/09/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/09/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/15/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/15/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/15/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/15/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/16/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/16/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/20/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/20/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/22/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/22/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/22/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/22/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/24/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 07/24/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/24/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/24/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/28/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/28/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/28/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/28/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/28/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/28/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/28/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/29/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/31/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/31/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/31/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/09/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/09/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/09/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/09/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 09/09/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/09/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/09/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/10/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/16/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 09/16/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/16/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/16/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/16/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/16/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 09/17/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 09/17/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/22/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/22/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/22/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/22/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/23/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/23/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/23/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/23/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/25/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/25/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/25/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/25/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/25/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/25/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/25/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/29/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/29/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/29/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/29/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/30/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 09/30/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/30/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/06/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/06/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/06/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/07/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/07/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/08/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 10/08/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 10/08/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/14/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 10/14/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 10/14/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 10/15/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 10/15/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 10/15/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 10/15/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/15/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/15/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/15/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/20/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/20/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 10/21/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 10/21/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/21/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 10/21/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/21/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/23/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 10/26/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/26/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/26/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/27/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/27/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/27/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/29/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/02/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/02/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 11/02/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/04/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 11/04/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 11/05/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 11/05/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/05/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/05/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/05/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/05/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/05/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 11/05/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 11/06/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/06/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/06/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/17/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/17/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/08/2009