Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/20/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/20/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 06/10/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/23/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 06/23/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/23/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/24/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/24/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/24/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/24/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/24/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/24/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/26/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/09/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/13/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/24/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/24/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/09/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/14/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/24/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/02/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/20/2010