Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 05/18/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/18/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 05/18/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/18/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 05/18/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/18/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/19/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/20/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/02/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/15/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/18/2010