Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/19/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/04/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/04/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/04/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/11/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/10/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/25/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/25/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/29/2010