Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/02/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/02/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/04/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/09/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/09/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/15/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/19/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/19/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/23/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/23/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/23/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/23/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/23/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/23/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/23/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/23/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/23/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/23/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/23/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 06/23/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/23/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/23/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/23/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/23/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/23/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/23/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/23/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/23/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/24/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/24/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/24/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/24/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/24/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/24/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/24/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/24/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/24/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/24/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/24/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/24/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/24/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/24/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/25/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/25/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/25/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/25/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/26/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/26/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/26/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/26/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/26/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/07/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/07/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/07/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/07/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/07/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/07/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 07/07/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/07/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/07/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/08/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/08/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/08/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/08/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/09/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/09/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/09/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/09/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/13/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/13/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/13/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/13/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/13/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/14/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/15/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/15/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/15/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/16/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/17/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/20/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/24/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/27/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/27/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/29/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/29/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/30/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/08/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/22/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/29/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/07/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/21/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/26/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 10/26/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/26/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/27/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 10/29/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/04/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/05/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/18/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/18/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/18/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/18/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/18/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 11/19/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/02/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/02/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 12/03/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/03/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 12/08/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 12/11/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/15/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 12/15/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 01/19/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 01/19/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/19/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 01/19/2010
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 01/19/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 01/19/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 01/21/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/21/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 01/26/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 01/26/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/26/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/26/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/27/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/02/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/02/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 02/22/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 02/22/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 02/25/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/02/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/03/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 03/11/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/24/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/14/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/15/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 04/15/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 04/20/2010
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 04/20/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/21/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/22/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/26/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/26/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/26/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/26/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/04/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/04/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/04/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/04/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 05/05/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/11/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/11/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/12/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/12/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/12/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/18/2010