Committees: H.R.2480 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/19/2009 Referred to
07/15/2010 Markup by
07/27/2010 Reported by H. Rept. 111-571
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Trade and Consumer Protection05/20/2009 Referred to
05/13/2010 Hearings by
06/30/2010 Markup by
06/30/2010 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation08/05/2010 Referred to
12/07/2010 Discharged from