Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/19/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/19/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/21/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/21/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/21/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/21/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/03/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/03/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/03/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/03/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/03/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/03/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/03/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/03/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/03/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/03/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/03/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/03/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/03/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/03/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/03/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/03/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/10/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/10/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/16/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/18/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/18/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/18/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/23/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/23/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/23/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/25/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/25/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/25/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/09/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/09/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/09/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/15/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/15/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/15/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/23/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/23/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/28/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/28/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/29/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/30/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/16/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/14/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/14/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/14/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/14/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/14/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/14/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/14/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/14/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/14/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 10/14/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/14/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/14/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/14/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 10/14/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/15/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/15/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 10/20/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/20/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 10/20/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/21/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/21/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/22/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/28/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 10/28/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/28/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/04/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 11/06/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 11/16/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 11/16/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/16/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/16/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/16/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/16/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/16/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/17/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/17/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/17/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/17/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/17/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/17/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/18/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 11/18/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/18/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/02/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 12/02/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/02/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 12/02/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 12/02/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/03/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 12/03/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/08/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/08/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/09/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/15/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 12/15/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/16/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/16/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/16/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 12/16/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 12/16/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/16/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 01/13/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/13/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 01/13/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 01/13/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 01/13/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/13/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 01/13/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 01/13/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 01/13/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/26/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 01/26/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 02/25/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/14/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/06/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/12/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/13/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/09/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/16/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/29/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew