Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/16/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/16/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/07/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/07/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/07/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/09/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/16/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/21/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 07/21/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/22/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/22/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/24/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/28/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/31/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/08/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/08/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/24/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/08/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/29/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/29/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/06/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/02/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 12/08/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 01/13/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 01/21/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 02/24/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/26/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/10/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/10/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/29/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/14/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/15/2010