Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/08/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 01/09/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/09/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 01/13/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 01/14/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 01/23/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/26/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 01/27/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/27/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/03/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/24/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/24/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/25/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/12/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/12/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/08/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/06/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/06/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/09/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/19/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 02/24/2010
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 06/16/2010
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 07/27/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/14/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/22/2010