Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/19/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/09/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/09/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 06/11/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/19/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/25/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/08/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 07/21/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 10/01/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/07/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 10/07/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/07/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 10/08/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/08/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/13/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/13/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 10/13/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 10/13/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/13/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/14/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 10/14/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/14/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/14/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/14/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/15/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/15/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 10/20/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/20/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 10/20/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 10/20/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/20/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/20/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/20/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 10/20/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 10/20/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 10/22/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/22/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 10/22/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/22/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 10/22/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/26/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/26/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/28/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/29/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/02/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 12/10/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 12/16/2009