Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/03/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/03/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/03/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 07/07/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/27/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/27/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 07/31/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/06/2009