Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/08/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/08/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/09/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/16/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/24/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/24/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/30/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/31/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/31/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/06/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 01/21/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/25/2010