Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/20/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1]* 05/20/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/04/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/04/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 06/12/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/12/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/18/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/18/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/25/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/08/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/24/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/10/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/15/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/16/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/29/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/03/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/02/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/23/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/15/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/15/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/15/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/15/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 05/06/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/18/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/18/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/18/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/18/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/14/2010