Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 06/03/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/03/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/08/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/08/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/08/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 06/10/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/08/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/19/2010