Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/09/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 09/25/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/02/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/16/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 11/19/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 11/19/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 12/01/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 12/10/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/14/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/02/2010