Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 05/20/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/20/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/21/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/21/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/21/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/03/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/03/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/03/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/03/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/03/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 06/12/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/10/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 11/06/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/06/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/06/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 11/06/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/06/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 11/06/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/06/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/06/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/02/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/02/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/16/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/23/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/23/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/25/2010