Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/13/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/20/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/24/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/15/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/15/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/15/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/15/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 09/15/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/07/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/07/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 10/07/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 10/21/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 10/21/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 10/21/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/21/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 10/21/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/21/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/21/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/21/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/21/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/21/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 10/28/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 10/28/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/28/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/28/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 10/28/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/04/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 11/04/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/14/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/19/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/19/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/20/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/21/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/26/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/27/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 02/02/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/02/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/03/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/04/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/14/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 04/26/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/05/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/06/2010
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/13/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/18/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/18/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/18/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 05/19/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/19/2010